OR HB2743 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of taxpayer election of reduced tax rate for certain pass-through income, reduces tax rates, reduces maximum eligible income and modifies employment requirements. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to elective reduced rate of taxation on pass-through income; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2743 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2743/Introduced |