OR HB2739 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows cause of action against patent holder for genetically engineered organism present on land without permission of owner or lawful occupant. Allows court to award prevailing plaintiff costs, attorney fees and treble economic damages.
Title
Relating to patent holder liability for genetically engineered organisms.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Barnhart [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |