OR HB2708 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Land Conservation and Development to approve local governments' plans for urban growth boundary expansion areas to accommodate affordable housing. Authorizes Department of Land Conservation and Development to approve local governments' plans for urban growth boundary expansion areas to accommodate affordable housing. Sunsets affordable housing pilot program on January 2, 2026.
Title
Relating to expansion of urban growth boundaries to accommodate affordable housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] |
Sen. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2708 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2708/Introduced |