OR HB2705 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows counties to authorize construction of accessory dwelling units on lands zoned for rural residential use. Allows counties to authorize construction of accessory dwelling units on lands zoned for rural residential use. Establishes conditions of approval for accessory dwelling units. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to map wildfire risk and to develop appropriate fire protection standards within state building code for accessory dwelling units based on fire risk identified in maps. Requires department and Oregon State University College of Forestry to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on updates to maps and state building code no later than September 15, 2022.
Title
Relating to accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Vikki Breese-Iverson [R] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2705 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2705/Introduced |