OR HB2699 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 492, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 492, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that brownfield granted property tax incentive benefit under chapter 96, Oregon Laws 2016, may be granted any other special assessment, exemption or partial exemption for which such property is eligible. Provides that brownfield granted property tax incentive benefit under chapter 96, Oregon Laws 2016, is eligible for] may be granted any other special assessment, exemption or partial exemption granted under other law] for which such property is eligible. Provides that total amount of all property tax benefits granted to brownfield under any law may not reduce property tax liability below zero for any property tax year. Provides that eligible costs of brownfield for purposes of determining property tax incentive benefit under chapter 96, Oregon Laws 2016, shall be reduced by any special assessment, exemption or partial exemption granted to brownfield under any law other than chapter 96, Oregon Laws 2016.] Requires jurisdiction granting brownfield property tax incentive benefit to specify how jurisdiction intends to apply multiple property tax benefits and to notify county assessor of intended application. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property tax incentive benefits for brownfields; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 492, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed. Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Power; Excused, 2--Barreto, Leif. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |