OR HB2684 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 164, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 164, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals exemption for property of company that builds, maintains and operates project constituting certain communication services infrastructure. Provides one-time special assessment of intangible property of certain companies in lieu of exemption repealed by Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax exemption for the property of a company that builds certain communication services infrastructure; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 164, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse, Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |