OR HB2676 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases threshold under which school district may receive additional State School Fund moneys for student eligible for special education. Increases amount transferred each year to High Cost Disabilities Account. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to distributions from the State School Fund for students with disabilities; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Committee Do pass, rescind subsequent referral to Revenue, and be referred to Student Success (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Student Success by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass, subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded, and be referred to Student Success. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |