OR HB2660 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 407, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 407, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes prohibition on payment of unemployment insurance benefits to nonprofessional employees of educational institution providing facilities or janitorial services for weeks of unemployment commencing during period between two successive academic years or terms. Prohibits reimbursable employer from advising, or communicating conclusion to, employee about employee's eligibility for unemployment insurance benefits] employer that is this state or political subdivision of this state from informing employee that employee is ineligible for unemployment insurance benefits unless Director of Employment Department has determined that employee is ineligible. Requires reimbursable] employer that is this state or political subdivision of this state to provide employees with any information about eligibility for benefits that is provided to employer by Employment Department] director. Authorizes reimbursable] employer that is this state or political subdivision of this state to provide employees with any other information about eligibility for benefits that is approved by department] director.
Title
Relating to eligibility for unemployment insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 407, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 43; Nays, 16--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 17--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 13, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |