OR HB2653 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates credit against income taxes for selling publicly supported housing to retain as affordable housing. Creates credit against income taxes for selling publicly supported housing to retain as affordable housing. Applies to sales of housing completed in tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, and before January 1, 2030. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for the preservation of publicly supported housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2023-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness with subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |