OR HB2634 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 250, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-24 - Chapter 250, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "recreational vehicle park" for the purposes of residential tenancy law. Defines "recreational vehicle park" for the purposes of residential tenancy law. Expands vacation occupancy exemption from residential tenancy laws to include recreational vehicle park occupancies of up to 90 days. Allows termination of tenancy without cause upon 14 days' notice for space siting recreational vehicle.] Reduces landlord requirements for disposal or sale of abandoned recreational vehicles.
Title
Relating to rental agreements for recreational vehicle spaces.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Rep. Anna Scharf [R] | Rep. Brian Stout [R] | Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-24 | House | Chapter 250, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Gelser Blouin, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Levy B. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Dexter, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Ruiz. |
2023-03-28 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Elmer. |
2023-03-27 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |