OR HB2615 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows veterans to participate in Oregon Promise program if first enrolled in classes within 12 months after discharge from military. Allows veterans to participate in Oregon Promise program if first enrolled in classes within 12 months after discharge from military. Permits veterans to participate in program without having to use GI Bill benefits or having program benefits reduced by amount received by GI Bill.
Title
Relating to participation in Oregon Promise program by veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Ben Bowman [D] |
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Annessa Hartman [D] |
Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Travis Nelson [D] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Nathan Sosa [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
Sen. Aaron Woods [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-02-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-01-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |