OR HB2581 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person that possesses or has access to account information to report breach of security to financial institution that issued financial access device. Requires person to safeguard account information in accordance with standards that Department of Consumer and Business Services adopts by rule. Subjects person to liability to financial institution for costs financial institution incurs as consequence of breach of security if person's failure to comply with standards for safeguarding account information amounts to gross negligence. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to breaches of security with respect to account information associated with financial access devices; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2581 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2581/Introduced |