OR HB2571 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 208, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 208, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that current or former foster child under 25 years of age is eligible for tuition waiver at institution of higher education if current or former foster child is enrolled in courses totaling one or more credit hours for purposes of pursuing initial undergraduate degree. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to higher education tuition waivers for foster children; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Barbara Warner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 208, (2019 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Boquist, Johnson, Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Winters. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |