OR HB2555 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that maximum loading weight of motorboat must be less than 4,000 pounds to obtain towed watersports motorboat certificate. Provides that maximum loading weight of motorboat must be less than 4,000 pounds to obtain towed watersports motorboat certificate. Authorizes State Marine Board to conduct study related to increasing prescribed maximum loading weight. Provides that person shall carry towed watersports endorsement if engaged in any towed watersports within Newberg Pool Congested Zone. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to motorboats; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2555 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2555/Introduced |