OR HB2500 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 159, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 159, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services, in consultation with Department of Justice, to develop and implement training and continuing education curriculum for caseworkers that informs and instructs caseworkers on their roles in juvenile dependency proceedings. Directs Department of Human Services, in consultation with Department of Justice, to develop and implement training and continuing education curriculum for caseworkers that informs and instructs caseworkers on their roles in juvenile dependency proceedings. Requires curriculum to include presentations by Department of Justice attorneys and to address circumstances under which caseworker may be engaging in unlicensed practice of law. Requires continuing education for caseworkers every four years.
Title
Relating to mandated training for Department of Human Services caseworkers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 159, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-12 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |