OR HB2484 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 305, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 305, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of State Fire Marshal to coordinate urban search and rescue function of this state. Directs Department of State Fire Marshal to coordinate urban search and rescue function of this state. Requires department to study needs of state related to urban search and rescue. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to emergency management no later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to urban search and rescue.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 305, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp, Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boice, Bynum, Walters; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2023-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-29 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |