OR HB2472 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 224, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 224, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Oregon Institute of Technology as Oregon's Polytechnic University. Designates Oregon Institute of Technology as Oregon's Polytechnic University.
Title
Relating to Oregon Institute of Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 224, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, Smith Warner. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Findley, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-03-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reschke, Neron. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Evans, Leif, Rayfield; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-03-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |