OR HB2471 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 67, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 67, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that, in prosecutions for violation of city motor vehicle parking ordinances, defendant may not be required to pay fine or bail amount before requesting hearing or submitting explanation to court. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to prosecutions for violation of city motor vehicle parking ordinances.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 67, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Findley, Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-03-26 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |