OR HB2470 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Water Resources Commission to conduct technical review of each well log submitted to commission. Requires Water Resources Commission to conduct technical review of each well log submitted to commission. Provides that commission may not enforce against licensed well constructor general or special standards related to construction, alteration, abandonment or conversion of well after three years from date that well constructor submitted well log to commission, unless commission finds that well log contains material misrepresentation.
Title
Relating to ground water.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2470 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2470/Introduced |