OR HB2457 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 195, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 195, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Teacher Standards and Practices Commission, Department of Education and Office of Child Care to make specified evaluations to increase number of educators in Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region who are available to teach courses in secondary math and science and in career and technical education programs. Directs commission, department and office to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2020] 2024. Sunsets December 31, 2020] 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to educators in the Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Student Success (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Student Success (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 195, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 30, 2019. |
2019-05-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Carried over to 05-22 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Keny-Guyer. |
2019-03-11 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Subsequent referral to Student Success rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-03-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Student Success be rescinded. |
2019-03-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |