OR HB2452 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Public Boarding Schools. Requires task force to submit report to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2018. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public boarding schools; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Knute Buehler [R] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2452 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2452/Introduced |