OR HB2441 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for tax credit for university venture development fund contributions. Extends sunset for tax credit for university venture development fund contributions.
Title
Relating to a tax credit for university venture development fund contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2021-05-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-10 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |