OR HB2436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 652, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 652, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of State Lands to collaborate with certain entities to develop proposal, including recommended legislation for introduction in 2020 regular session, for department to assume partial authority to administer federal wetland dredge and fill permits. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Allows payment for off-site compensatory mitigation to be made to Oregon Removal-Fill Mitigation Fund even if mitigation bank credits are available. Modifies requirements applicable to Director of Department of State Lands in determining whether to issue fill or removal permit.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to removal-fill laws; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | House | Chapter 652, (2019 Laws): Effective date August 9, 2019. |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Burdick, Golden, Prozanski; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-30 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by McLain. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 9--Fahey, Keny-Guyer, Marsh, Meek, Nosse, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Salinas; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Wilson. |
2019-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 30, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-29 | House | Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means carried. Rereferred. Ayes, 35; Nays, 18--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 6--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, McLane, Noble, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | House | Third reading. |
2019-06-28 | House | Carried over to June 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 28, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 26, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-14 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |