OR HB2436 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Oregon Infrastructure Finance Authority to provide financial assistance for levee projects that contribute to improvement, expansion or repair of infrastructure systems and are essential for use or development of farm, industrial or commercial land. Allows Water Resources Department to inspect, evaluate and assess condition of levee with owner's permission and certify levee for accreditation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to levee infrastructure; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-05-06 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use and Water. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |