OR HB2432 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to study trends in reimbursement paid to specified health care providers by insurers and third party administrators and report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health no later than September 15, 2024. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to study trends in reimbursement paid to specified health care providers by insurers and third party administrators and report findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health no later than September 15, 2024. Sunsets January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care providers; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |