OR HB2364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 292, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 292, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends requirements and deadlines for sales of manufactured dwelling facilities. Before its sale to third party, requires owner of residential dwelling facility to give tenants 20 days to form tenants committee and to give any tenants committee right of first refusal. Makes other procedural amendments to conducting facility sales.] Amends requirements and deadlines for sales of manufactured dwelling facilities. Amends statutory damages owed for violations by sellers and requires plaintiffs to share damages with Manufactured Dwelling Parks Account.
Title
Relating to sales of residential dwelling facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 292, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Taylor. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Noble. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |