OR HB2340 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 206, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 206, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Consumer and Business Services to permit insurer that discontinued offering health benefit plans in service area less than five years previously to resume offering health benefit plans in service area. Reorganizes and updates references to statutes applicable to health care service contractors and multiple employer welfare arrangements. Repeals obsolete health insurance requirements.
Title
Relating to the applicability of statutes that pertain to health insurance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 206, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Prozanski. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-03-21 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |