OR HB2333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 585, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 585, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows option to obtain title, but not registration, from Department of Transportation for recreational vehicle qualifying as park model recreational vehicle and meeting other criteria. Provides that recreational vehicle having title issued by Department of Transportation does not qualify as structure. Requires owner to surrender Department of Transportation title for recreational vehicle if converting recreational vehicle to use as structure. Makes recreational vehicle converted to use as structure subject to state building code. Requires seller of new recreational vehicle to provide purchaser with written information listing specified living area systems. Requires that information state for each listed system whether items or components comprising system are covered by warranty and, if so, extent and length of warranty. Removes recreational vehicle construction from regulation by Department of Consumer and Business Services. Changes definition of "recreational vehicle."
Title
Relating to recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Gregory Barreto [R] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 585, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, McLane, Noble, Wallan. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill. (Printed C-Eng.) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Nosse, Rayfield. |
2019-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 17, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-05 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |