OR HB2330 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 355, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 355, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent school district funding for foreign exchange students and small school district grants. Makes permanent school district funding for foreign exchange students and small school district grants. Increases weighted average daily membership limit for purpose of distributions to small school districts. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to State School Fund distributions; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 355, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Smith Warner; Excused, 3--Evans, Helm, Sanchez. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |