OR HB2328 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-12)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies culpable mental state for crime of unauthorized use of a vehicle when person takes, operates, exercises control over or otherwise uses vehicle, boat or aircraft without consent of owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unauthorized use of a vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16HouseGovernor signed.
2019-06-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Bentz.
2019-06-18SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-14SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-13SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-12HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
2019-06-12HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-07HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-30HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-05-30HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-21HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback