OR HB2296 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Chapter 43, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Chapter 43, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset from 2024 to 2034 on provisions allowing retired member of Public Employees Retirement System to be reemployed by participating public employer for unlimited number of hours without reduction in pension benefits. Makes permanent] Extends sunset from 2024 to 2034 on provisions allowing retired member of Public Employees Retirement System to be reemployed by participating public employer for unlimited number of hours without reduction in pension benefits.
Title
Relating to reemployment of retired members of the Public Employees Retirement System.
Sponsors
Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Emerson Levy [D] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Hai Pham [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Chapter 43, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 3--Boquist, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 5--Girod, Gorsek, Linthicum, Prozanski, Smith DB. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Dexter, Evans, Javadi, Nguyen D, Nguyen H; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2023-03-23 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |