OR HB2285 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter 82, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter 82, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes obsolete provisions relating to Social Security Revolving Account. Removes obsolete provisions relating to Social Security Revolving Account.
Title
Relating to the Social Security Revolving Account.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Motion to Rerefer (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Motion to Rerefer (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | House | Chapter 82, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-05-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-05-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Girod, Gorsek. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Committee on Labor and Business failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Girod, Gorsek. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Tran. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Boice, Bynum, Walters; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boshart Davis, Scharf. |
2023-04-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-30 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 3, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-03-29 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-03 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans by order of Speaker. |
2023-02-03 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |