OR HB2272 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 520, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Lane County to approve planning application to make permanent certain temporary recreational vehicle parks or campgrounds providing transitional housing for wildfire victims. Directs Department of Land Conservation and Development to study issues relating to use of land and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022.] Sunsets December 31, 2022.] Requires Lane County to approve planning application to make permanent certain temporary recreational vehicle parks or campgrounds providing transitional housing for wildfire victims. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Allows local governments to consider National Flood Insurance Program requirements in approving application to alter, restore or replace nonresidential use destroyed by 2020 wildfires. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of land; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 520, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-06-14SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-06-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Clem, Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman.
2021-06-09HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-07HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-28HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2272
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2272/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2272/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2272/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2272/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32790
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=529618
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33014
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532964

Bill Comments

feedback