OR HB2243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that declarations and extensions of states of emergency under certain statutes be accompanied by written explanations. Requires that declarations and extensions of states of emergency under certain statutes be accompanied by written explanations. Establishes durational limits for states of emergency declared under certain statutes. Provides that certain extensions of states of emergency may be made only if Governor first convenes Legislative Assembly. Provides that emergency rules and orders expire upon termination of state of emergency. Provides that, after termination of state of emergency, Governor may not declare another state of emergency for same purpose unless so authorized by Legislative Assembly. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to declarations of emergency; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 27 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-04 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 28--Bynum, Campos, Clem, Fahey, Grayber, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Witt; Excused, 5--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Helm, Nearman, Ruiz. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |