OR HB2218 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Business Development Department to study impact of laws related to wetlands on economic development and to provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Directs Department of State Lands] Oregon Business Development Department to study impact of laws related to wetlands on economic development and to provide results of study in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to economic development; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business, then Ways and Means. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 12--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |