OR HB2213 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 99, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 99, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes employees of Department of Corrections who have direct contact with inmates in category of employees for which on-the-job safety issues are employment relations issues subject to collective bargaining.
Title
Relating to issues subject to collective bargaining for Department of Corrections employees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Chapter 99, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-05-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barton, Esquivel. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |