OR HB2201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 527, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Chapter 527, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Veteran Educational Bridge Grant Program within Department of Veterans' Affairs. Requires department to conduct outreach and provide grants to veterans enrolled in certain courses of study who are unable to complete degree program in expected completion period due to unavailability of courses. Sunsets January 2, 2022. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to veterans; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | House | Chapter 527, (2019 Laws): Effective date July 15, 2019. |
2019-07-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |