OR HB2180 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes right of employee for civil action based on unpaid wages. Authorizes creation of lien on employer's real and personal property for unpaid wages under certain circumstances. Establishes priority of lien for amounts of unpaid wages up to specified amount. Creates exception.
Title
Relating to establishing a lien on employer property based on an unpaid wage claim.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2180 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2180/Introduced |