OR HB2172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to issue grant to Coos County for purpose of establishing public access to Lighthouse Beach. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to issue grant to Coos County for purpose of establishing public access to Lighthouse Beach. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to Lighthouse Beach; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |