OR HB2167 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 612, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 612, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Racial Justice Council within Office of Governor. Directs Office of Governor to study and make recommendations regarding certain proposals relating to state boards and commissions. Requires office to submit report on findings by January 1, 2023.] Creates Racial Justice Council within Office of Governor. Directs council to report at least once per year on strategies designed to institutionalize racial justice into conduct of state business. Directs council to provide advice and recommendations to Governor relating to racial justice. Directs council to advise and assist state agencies in creating racial impact statements for programs in agency request budgets. Directs council to communicate with Legislative Assembly to monitor investments in and track progress toward racial equity. Requires state agencies to include racial impact statements with agency request budgets. Requires Governor's budget to include narrative summarizing racial impact statements.
Title
Relating to state entities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 612, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 2--Ruiz, Wilde. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-01 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-05-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |