OR HB2167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates unlawful employment practice and violation of Oregon Safe Employment Act for creating or maintaining abusive work environment.
Title
Relating to workplace bullying.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2167 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2167/Introduced |