OR HB2129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates sunsets for certain transportation-related tax expenditures. Extends and] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transportation-related tax expenditures; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-05-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |