OR HB2072 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 447, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 447, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases fees for licenses for home health agencies. Increases fees for licenses for home health agencies.
Title
Relating to home health agency licensing fees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 447, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-15 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 19--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Noble; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Fahey, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-07 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |