OR HB2059 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defines "qualified designated voter registration agency." Directs qualified designated voter registration agencies to provide Secretary of State with age, residence and citizenship data and digital signature of each person who meets qualifications set by secretary by rule. Directs secretary to register to vote each nonregistered person who is qualified to vote and to notify persons how to cancel registration and how to adopt or change political party affiliation. Increases maximum number of electors in precinct from 5,000 to 10,000. Allows person who is at least 16 years of age to register to vote. Establishes July 1, 2015, as date for determination of total number of registered electors in this state for purpose of maintaining status as minor political party for 2016 general election. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to elections; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Rules.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback