OK SR42 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-9)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; expressing appreciation to Senate executive assistant Donna Garlick; thanking her for her dedication and service; wishing her well upon her retirement; declaring May 11, 2022, as Donna Garlick Day in Oklahoma.
Title
Resolution; expressing appreciation to Senate executive assistant Donna Garlick; thanking her for her dedication and service; wishing her well upon her retirement; declaring May 11, 2022, as Donna Garlick Day in Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled, filed with Secretary of State |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Considered |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Quinn |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2022-05-10 | Senate | First Reading |