OK SJR47 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR47
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution creating Joint Task Force on Apportionment of State Revenue. Emergency.
Title
Joint resolution creating Joint Task Force on Apportionment of State Revenue. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: JCR (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: JCR (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget committee; JCR filed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2017-05-22 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR47 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Second Reading, direct to Joint Calendar