OK SJR44 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 27
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 27
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; modifying Constitutional Reserve Fund limit. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; modifying Constitutional Reserve Fund limit. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 27 |
2016-04-21 | House | Title stricken |
2016-04-21 | House | Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | General Order |
2016-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Montgomery (principal House author) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |