OK SJR30 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-13 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; restricting ability of Legislature to consider certain measures during certain years. Ballot title.
Title
Constitutional amendment; restricting ability of Legislature to consider certain measures during certain years. Ballot title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: B DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2015-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Holt |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |