OK SJR15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment; prohibiting discrimination based on race or sex in public employment, education or contracts; ballot.
Title
Constitutional Amendment; prohibiting discrimination based on race or sex in public employment, education or contracts; ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 56 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 56 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Motion expired | |
2011-04-27 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Inman | |
2011-04-27 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 14 | |
2011-04-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Grau, Faught, Ritze, Derby, McCullough | |
2011-04-27 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jackson, Trebilcock | |
2011-04-07 | Remove Representative Jackson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Osborn | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 15 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-14 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |