OK SCR4 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-9)
Status: Passed on February 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent resolution; encouraging the Cattlemen's Congress to continue meeting in Oklahoma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent resolution; encouraging the Cattlemen's Congress to continue meeting in Oklahoma.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2021-02-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-02-23SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-02-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-02-22HouseAdopted, returned to Senate
2021-02-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Hasenbeck, Russ
2021-02-22HouseConsidered
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced
2021-02-18SenateEngrossed to House
2021-02-18SenateAdopted, referred for engrossment
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2021-02-18SenateDirect to Calendar
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-03SenateCoauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author)
2021-02-03SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback